Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Shoemaker, Andrew S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shoemaker, Shella B, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2023 |
CategoryDn - Domestic Relations Without Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Filing Discovery |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Dissolution Hearing | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 8/10/2023 : Daniel Lawrence Lauer;Richard Walter Karcher Order Granting Agreement of Parties ---- 8/10/2023 : Daniel Lawrence Lauer;Richard Walter Karcher |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Final Dissolution Hearing scheduled for 08/14/2023 at 9:00 AM was cancelled. Reason: Agreed Resolution. |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Agreement of Parties Order Approving Joint Stipulation To Continue Hearing. |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed E-FILING APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY IN CIVIL CASE |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order for Hearing ---- 6/6/2023 : Shella B Shoemaker Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 6/6/2023 : Shella B Shoemaker |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order for Hearing ---- 6/6/2023 : Daniel Lawrence Lauer Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 6/6/2023 : Daniel Lawrence Lauer |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Notice Issued to Parties ---- 6/5/2023 : Shella B Shoemaker |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.