Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cooley, Jeremy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cooley, Gretchen L, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2023 |
CategoryDc - Domestic Relations With Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Dismiss ---- 11/6/2023 : Angelica Nicole Fuelling |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Dismiss ---- 11/6/2023 : Gretchen L Cooley |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Cause dismissed. Costs paid. |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 10/25/2023 : Gretchen L Cooley |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 10/25/2023 : Angelica Nicole Fuelling |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Filed Motion to Dismiss |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Petitioner filed a Verified Motion to Dismiss on October 24, 2023. Pursuant to I.C. 31-15-2-12, Respondent has ten (10) days from the date of this Order to file a Counter Petition for Dissolution of Marriage or the matter shall be dismissed. |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit for Service of Process |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 6/26/2023 : Gretchen L Cooley |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.