We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Discover Bank C/O Discover Products Inc. V. Cody Barnes

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago

Discover Bank C O Discover Products Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nicole D Manhart, against Barnes, Cody W, in the jurisdiction of Adams County. This case was filed in Adams County Superior Courts .

Case Details for Discover Bank C O Discover Products Inc. v. Barnes, Cody W

Filing Date

January 07, 2021

Category

Cc - Civil Collection

Last Refreshed

March 13, 2024

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

Adams County, IN

Matter Type

Collections

Parties for Discover Bank C O Discover Products Inc. v. Barnes, Cody W

Plaintiffs

Discover Bank C O Discover Products Inc.

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Nicole D Manhart

Defendants

Barnes, Cody W

Case Documents for Discover Bank C O Discover Products Inc. v. Barnes, Cody W

Release Filed

Date: May 05, 2021

Default Judgment entered

Date: April 14, 2021

Service Returned Served

Date: March 01, 2021

Appearance Filed

Date: January 07, 2021

Subpoena/Summons Filed

Date: January 07, 2021

Case Events for Discover Bank C O Discover Products Inc. v. Barnes, Cody W

Type Description
Docket Event Automated ENotice Issued to Parties
Order to Release Judgment ---- 5/6/2021 : Nicole D Manhart
Docket Event Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties
Order to Release Judgment ---- 5/6/2021 : CODY W BARNES
Docket Event Order to Release Judgment
Docket Event Release Filed
Release Of Judgment
Docket Event Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties
Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 4/14/2021 : CODY W BARNES Default Judgment entered ---- 4/14/2021 : CODY W BARNES
Docket Event Automated ENotice Issued to Parties
Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 4/14/2021 : Nicole D Manhart Default Judgment entered ---- 4/14/2021 : Nicole D Manhart
Docket Event Motion for Default Judgment Filed
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Docket Event Default Judgment entered
Docket Event Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment
Docket Event Service Returned Served
Complaint/Summons Served On Def By Mailing/Leaving Copies On 2/25/2021 By Deputy Habegger ACSD
See all events