We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Sac Finance, Inc. V. Joshua Smith

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago

Sac Finance, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ramon Scott Perry, Ronald James Tirpak, against Smith, Joshua E, in the jurisdiction of Adams County. This case was filed in Adams County Superior Courts .

Case Details for Sac Finance, Inc. v. Smith, Joshua E

Filing Date

February 09, 2018

Category

Cc - Civil Collection

Last Refreshed

March 24, 2024

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

Adams County, IN

Matter Type

Collections

Parties for Sac Finance, Inc. v. Smith, Joshua E

Plaintiffs

Sac Finance, Inc.

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Ramon Scott Perry

Ronald James Tirpak

Defendants

Smith, Joshua E

Other Parties

Elkhart Products Corp (Epc) (Garnishee Defendant)

Case Documents for Sac Finance, Inc. v. Smith, Joshua E

Case Events for Sac Finance, Inc. v. Smith, Joshua E

Type Description
Docket Event Proceedings Supplemental
Docket Event Automated ENotice Issued to Parties
Order to Release Judgment ---- 4/6/2022 : Ramon Scott Perry;Ronald James Tirpak
Docket Event Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties
Order to Release Judgment ---- 4/6/2022 : Joshua E Smith;ELKHART PRODUCTS CORP (EPC)
Docket Event Order to Release Judgment
Docket Event Release Filed
Release Of Judgment
Docket Event Automated ENotice Issued to Parties
Order Granting Motion to Vacate Hearing ---- 4/5/2022 : Ramon Scott Perry;Ronald James Tirpak Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 4/5/2022 : Ramon Scott Perry;Ronald James Tirpak
Docket Event Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties
Order Granting Motion to Vacate Hearing ---- 4/5/2022 : Joshua E Smith;ELKHART PRODUCTS CORP (EPC) Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 4/5/2022 : Joshua E Smith;ELKHART PRODUCTS CORP (EPC)
Docket Event Hearing Scheduling Activity
Proceedings Supplemental scheduled for 05/26/2022 at 1:30 PM was cancelled. Reason: Waiver of Hearing by Party.
Docket Event Motion to Dismiss Filed
MOTION TO DISMISS PROCEEDING SUPPLEMENTAL
Docket Event Order Granting Motion to Vacate Hearing
See all events