We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Parts Student Loan Trust V Darla Doss

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago

Parts Student Loan Trust 2007-Ct1, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Stephen John Lerch, against Doss, Darla, in the jurisdiction of Adams County. This case was filed in Adams County Superior Courts .

Case Details for Parts Student Loan Trust 2007-Ct1 v. Doss, Darla

Filing Date

December 18, 2012

Category

Cc - Civil Collection

Last Refreshed

March 18, 2024

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

Adams County, IN

Matter Type

Collections

Parties for Parts Student Loan Trust 2007-Ct1 v. Doss, Darla

Plaintiffs

Parts Student Loan Trust 2007-Ct1

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Stephen John Lerch

Defendants

Doss, Darla

Case Events for Parts Student Loan Trust 2007-Ct1 v. Doss, Darla

Type Description
Docket Event Converted Event
ALL FILINGS AS OF 1/2/2018 WILL BE SCANNED AND VIEWABLE AS DIGITAL IMAGES. NO MORE PAPER FILINGS WILL BE KEPT IN THIS FILE. (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 12/29/2017
Docket Event Converted Event
Entry of 3/27/13 was changed to show paperwork being issued. pjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 03/28/2013
Docket Event Converted Event
Order of Judgment entered. Judgment entered against Darla Doss in the amount of $24,117.19 plus Court costs of $152.00. Copy to be issued to parties and counsel. RJO js 3/26/13 Order filed. 3/28/13 Iss copies to def & coun. pjh J 15 PG 74 (DISPOSED: BD ) (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 03/27/2013
Docket Event Converted Event
Entry of 2/4/13 was changed to show paperwork being issued. pjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/05/2013
Docket Event Converted Event
Order Relating to Motion for Summary Judgment entered. If no response is filed within 30 days, the Court will grant summary judgment. Copies to be issued to the defendant and counsel for plaintiff. RJO ka 2/5/13 Order filed. Iss copies to def & coun. pjh (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/04/2013
Docket Event Converted Event
Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, Motion for Court Not to Conduct Hearing and Notice filed by Stephen J. Lerch, counsel for plaintiff. ka (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/04/2013
Docket Event Converted Event
Answer to the Complaint filed by Darla Doss, defendant. Issued copy to counsel. pjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 01/14/2013
Docket Event Converted Event
Entry of 12/18/12 was changed to show proof of service. pjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 01/07/2013
Docket Event Converted Event
Entry of 12/18/12 was changed to show paperwork being issued. pjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 12/19/2012
Docket Event Converted Event
Docket Level Entry: Judgment - Book: 15 Page: 74
See all events