We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Capital One V Dale Tyler

Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago

Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by James D Boscia, against Tyler, Dale L, in the jurisdiction of Adams County. This case was filed in Adams County Superior Courts .

Case Details for Capital One Bank v. Tyler, Dale L

Filing Date

November 25, 2009

Category

Cc - Civil Collection

Last Refreshed

March 20, 2024

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

Adams County, IN

Matter Type

Collections

Parties for Capital One Bank v. Tyler, Dale L

Plaintiffs

Capital One Bank

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

James D Boscia

Defendants

Tyler, Dale L

Case Events for Capital One Bank v. Tyler, Dale L

Type Description
Docket Event Converted Event
ALL FILINGS AS OF 1/2/2018 WILL BE SCANNED AND VIEWABLE AS DIGITAL IMAGES. NO MORE PAPER FILINGS WILL BE KEPT IN THIS FILE. (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 12/29/2017
Docket Event Converted Event
3/5/10 Order filed. 3/8/10 Iss copies to def & coun. pjh 3/11/10 Received def's mail back marked- RETURN TO SENDER, MOVED, LEFT NO ADDRESS. Issued copy to counsel. pjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 03/05/2010
Docket Event Converted Event
Motion For Dismissal Versus Defendant, Dale L Tyler, Without Prejudice filed by James D Boscia, Atty for the plaintiff. pjh Order Of Dismissal Versus Defendant Dale L Tyler, Without Prejudice entered. Copy to be issued to parties and counsel. RJO js Brad Weber, Judge ProTempore (DISPOSED: DI ) (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 03/05/2010
Docket Event Converted Event
Complaint and Appearance filed by James Boscia, Atty for the plaintiff. Copies to the defendant by Sheriff/Adams Co, copies to counsel. pjh 11/30/09 Iss copies to def by Sheriff/Adams Co, copy to counsel. pjh 12/2/09 Received def's paperwork back UNSERVED, PARTY NOT FOUND, MOVED dated 12/1/09 by Deputy Callahan. pjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 11/25/2009
See all events