We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc V. Aaron Cox

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago

Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bruce G Arnold, against Cox, Aaron, in the jurisdiction of Adams County. This case was filed in Adams County Superior Courts .

Case Details for Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc v. Cox, Aaron

Filing Date

July 31, 2018

Category

Cc - Civil Collection

Last Refreshed

March 11, 2024

Practice Area

Creditor

Filing Location

Adams County, IN

Matter Type

Collections

Parties for Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc v. Cox, Aaron

Plaintiffs

Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Bruce G Arnold

Defendants

Cox, Aaron

Case Events for Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc v. Cox, Aaron

Type Description
Docket Event Converted Event
Entry of 1/11/19- 1/15/19 Iss copies to def & plaintiff, Efiled to counsel. pjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 01/15/2019
Docket Event Converted Event
Default Judgment entered (RJO) Copies to be issued to parties and counsel of record. Judgment against the defendant in the amount of $1943.03 plus costs. nj (DISPOSED: DE ) (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 01/11/2019
Docket Event Converted Event
Motion for Default Judgment efiled 1/10/19 by Bruce G Arnold, counsel for plaintiff. Copy emailed to counsel. cjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 01/11/2019
Docket Event Converted Event
Return of Service efiled 10/11/18 by Bruce Arnold, counsel for plaintiff. Copy emailed to counsel. cjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 10/12/2018
Docket Event Converted Event
Complaint Efiled by Burce G Arnold, Atty for the plaintiff on 7/31/18. pjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 07/31/2018
Docket Event Converted Event
Apperance Efiled by Bruce G Arnold, Atty for the plaintiff on 7/31/18. pjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 07/31/2018
Docket Event Converted Event
Total eFiled amount of $157.00 assessed. (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 07/31/2018
Docket Event Converted Event
Summons Efiled by Bruce G Arnold, Atty for the plaintiff on 7/31/18. pjh 7/31/18 Efiled all copies back to counsel for service on defendant. pjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 07/31/2018
See all events