We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Wells Fargo Bank V Gregory Hagen

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago

Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Alan W Mcewan, against Hagen, Gregory A, in the jurisdiction of Adams County. This case was filed in Adams County Superior Courts .

Case Details for Wells Fargo Bank Na v. Hagen, Gregory A

Filing Date

June 22, 2011

Category

Mf - Mortgage Foreclosure

Last Refreshed

March 15, 2024

Practice Area

Property

Filing Location

Adams County, IN

Matter Type

Foreclosure

Parties for Wells Fargo Bank Na v. Hagen, Gregory A

Plaintiffs

Wells Fargo Bank Na

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Alan W Mcewan

Defendants

Hagen, Gregory A

Case Events for Wells Fargo Bank Na v. Hagen, Gregory A

Type Description
Docket Event Converted Event
Scanned case documents and orders prior to implementation of scanning management system for entire file prior to 2014. km (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 05/11/2018
Docket Event Converted Event
ALL FILINGS AS OF 1/2/2018 WILL BE SCANNED AND VIEWABLE AS DIGITAL IMAGES. NO MORE PAPER FILINGS WILL BE KEPT IN THIS FILE. (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 12/29/2017
Docket Event Converted Event
3/23/12 order filed, entry added from 3/23/12 to reflect copies issued to deft & counsel. cjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 03/26/2012
Docket Event Converted Event
Order Setting Aside Judgment And Decree Of Foreclosure And Of Dismissal entered (RJO). Copies to be issued per Order. kb (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 03/23/2012
Docket Event Converted Event
Motion to Set Aside Judgment and Decree of Foreclosure and to Dismiss Complaint to Foreclose Mortgage filed by Alan W McEwan, attorney for plaintiff. cjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 03/23/2012
Docket Event Converted Event
Sheriff's Sale Packet received. cjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/15/2012
Docket Event Converted Event
Praecipe for Sheriff Sale; filed by ALAN W MCEWAN, attorney for plaintiff. Execution, Return of Service, Copies issued to ACSD. Copies issued to counsel. cjh Ex K Pg 459 (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/09/2012
Docket Event Converted Event
Praecipe for Sheriff Sale; filed by ALAN W MCEWAN, attorney for plaintiff. Execution, Return of Service, Copies issued to ACSD. Copies issued to counsel. cjh Ex K Pg 454 (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 12/14/2011
Docket Event Converted Event
Entry updated 11/15/11 to reflect mail returned. Entry to counsel. cjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 11/28/2011
Docket Event Converted Event
11/16/11 Order filed, 11/17/11 entry added from 11/15/11 to reflect copies issued to deft & counsel. cjh (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 11/17/2011
See all events