Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Medina, Amanda, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Aggen, Bernadette, Marcelino, Don, Mercedes, Julio, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Duesdieker, George presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 26, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time94 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING Small Claims Notice of Entry of Judgment WITH AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | No Longer Under Submission | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Matter Taken Under Submission Matter under submission:Small Claims Judicial officer:Duesdieker Judge: Duesdieker, George |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Decision Sheet | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Parties sign Stipulation and Order Appointing Judge Pro Tem | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Small Claims Hearing 01/28/2019 Small Claims Hearing Judge: Duesdieker, George |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Small Claims Request for Continuance | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Request for Reset UNABLE TO SERVE DEFENDANTS Small Claims Request for Reset UNABLE TO SERVE DEFENDANTS |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS Certified Mail on Plaintiff's Claim AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.