Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gaffney, Edith, Schultz, David, Tyz, Ryan, Wendrow, Shana, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Moalem, Michelle, represented by Minton, John D, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with George A. Miram presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2018 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Request for Dismissal - Initial Petition - Doc
Date: October 23, 2019Petition (Subsequent)
Date: June 04, 2019Declaration
Date: May 25, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: October 04, 2019Petition (Subsequent)
Date: June 04, 2019Petition (Probate proceeding not specified) - INITIAL
Date: April 13, 2018Response
Date: May 22, 2018Petition (Subsequent Accounting)
Date: January 18, 2019Order
Date: October 02, 2019Ex Parte Petition
Date: October 02, 2019Request for Dismissal - Supplemental Petition
Date: October 11, 2019Request for Dismissal - Supplemental Petition
Date: October 11, 2019Request for Dismissal - Supplemental Petition
Date: October 08, 2019Objection/Opposition to (re Trust)
Date: June 07, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: February 11, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: December 18, 2018Document
Date: August 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 11/22/2019 Petition Hearing TO CONFIRM SECOND AMENDMENT TO TRUST AS OPERATIVE Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
~PRO Minute Order - Other hearing 11/22/2019 Other hearing Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing PETITION TO DETERMINE ENTITLEMENT TO DISTRIBUTION UNDER TRUST Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Initial Petition - Doc PETITION FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY, FOR ACCOUNTING AND Request for Dismissal - Initial Petition - Doc PETITION FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY, FOR ACCOUNTING AND TO REMOVE TRUSTEE with Prejudice |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service PETITION TO CONFIRM SECOND AMENDMENT TO TRUST AS O Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service PETITION TO CONFIRM SECOND AMENDMENT TO TRUST AS OPERATIVE |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF PRIOR TRUSTE Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF PRIOR TRUSTEE, ETC |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Supplemental Petition FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF PRIOR TRUSTEE AN Request for Dismissal - Supplemental Petition FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF PRIOR TRUSTEE AND REQUEST FOR REIMBURSEMENT AND FEES with Prejudice |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Supplemental Petition PETITION TO CONFIRM SECOND AMENDMENT TO TRUST AS OPERA Request for Dismissal - Supplemental Petition PETITION TO CONFIRM SECOND AMENDMENT TO TRUST AS OPERATIVE with Prejudice |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Supplemental Petition PETITION TO DETERMINE ENTITLEMENT TO DISTRIBUTION ETC. Request for Dismissal - Supplemental Petition PETITION TO DETERMINE ENTITLEMENT TO DISTRIBUTION ETC. FILED 06/04 with Prejudice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.