Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Clark, Aaron L., Davis, Yvonne, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Loew, Jeffrey R., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with George A. Miram presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge A. Miram Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2018 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Request for Special Notice
Date: July 23, 2018Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: April 02, 2018Reply Filed
Date: September 16, 2020Objection/Opposition to
Date: September 02, 2020Petition (Subsequent)
Date: July 13, 2020Request for Special Notice
Date: October 23, 2018Request for Special Notice
Date: October 04, 2018Objection/Opposition to
Date: April 26, 2018Petition for Letters of
Date: April 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Probate, - |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
~PRO Minute Order - Trial Setting Conference 01/11/2021 Trial Setting Conference Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continuance Fee re TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE From 1/11/2021 To 4/12/2021 |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order ESTABLISHING ENTITLEMENT TO COMMUNITY PROPERTY SHARE OF REAL PROPERTY Notice of Entry of Order ESTABLISHING ENTITLEMENT TO COMMUNITY PROPERTY SHARE OF REAL PROPERTY |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order ESTABLISHING ENTITLEMENT TO COMMUNITY PROPERTY SHARE OF REAL PROPERTY Order ESTABLISHING ENTITLEMENT TO COMMUNITY PROPERTY SHARE OF REAL PROPERTY |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order received | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
~PRO Minute Order - Petition Hearing 10/08/2020 Petition Hearing VERIFIED PETITION TO DETERMINE HEIRSHIP Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of REPLY OF PETITIONER YVONNE DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED served on SEE SE Proof of Service by MAIL of REPLY OF PETITIONER YVONNE DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED served on SEE SERVICE LIST |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed OF PETITIONER YVONNE DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION TO DETERMINE HERISHIP Reply Filed OF PETITIONER YVONNE DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION TO DETERMINE HERISHIP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.