Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Yim, Ron, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mciver, Katie, against Dhandwar Brothers Trucking, Inc., A Business Entity, Dhandwar Trucking, Inc., A Business Entity, Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive, Singh, Jasvir, represented by Espinosa, Razelle P, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Nancy L. Fineman presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management133 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2018 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial423 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time396 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Ron Yim against Jasvir Singh, Dhandwar Brothers Trucking, Inc., Dhandwar Trucking, Inc., and Does 1 through 20. Ron Yim alleges negligence on the part of the defendants, claiming that on October 26, 2017, t...
Complaint
Date: September 21, 2018Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: April 09, 2019Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: October 09, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 09, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: January 17, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 5 DAYS
Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice- ENTIRE ACTION- EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN FEES AND COSTS Request For Dismissal With Prejudice- ENTIRE ACTION- EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN FEES AND COSTS |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal 11/26/19 Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal 11/26/19 |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept 11 STIP & ORDER TO ADR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.