Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Queiros, Talita, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Kleczek, David A, against Dane Technologies Inc., Does 1 To 30, Target Corporation, Tate, Frederick, represented by Livingston, Rene Welze, Mirshafei, Kaveh, Scheley, P. Christian, Esq, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management126 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2018 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial803 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Talita Queiros against Target Corporation and others. The complaint alleges that on July 12, 2016, Queiros was injured at a Target store in Daly City, CA due to th...
Complaint
Date: July 25, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: July 10, 2019Order
Date: July 17, 2019Exhibits submitted in support of
Date: June 16, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 07, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: August 24, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 04, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion for
Date: June 16, 2020Separate Statement
Date: June 16, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 28, 2020Objection
Date: August 28, 2020Motion
Date: October 15, 2020Case Management Order
Date: July 25, 2018Statement
Date: July 25, 2018Order
Date: July 25, 2018Answer (Unlimited)
Date: October 16, 2018Order
Date: July 25, 2018Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 03, 2019Order
Date: July 25, 2018Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: October 16, 2018Cross Complaint
Date: October 16, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2019Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: January 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 10, 2019Order Denying
Date: May 22, 2019Notice of Entry of Order
Date: July 19, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 15, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: October 07, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 09, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 08, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 03, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 30, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: September 28, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 16, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: August 24, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 09, 2020Objection
Date: August 28, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 21, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 26, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 21, 2020Motion for a new trial
Date: November 04, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: May 10, 2021Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR
Date: May 12, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: June 04, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 22, 2021Order
Date: December 09, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: April 21, 2021Statement of Non-Agreement
Date: August 09, 2021Motion to Tax Costs
Date: September 29, 2021Motion
Date: August 25, 2021DEPOSITION TESTIMONY AT TRIAL with POS
Date: June 22, 2022MIL 1 Exclude Evidence Alleged Stmts of Target Team Members w POS
Date: June 24, 2022Queiros MIL 2
Date: June 23, 2022Queiros MIL 1
Date: June 23, 2022Queiros MIL 3
Date: June 23, 2022MIL 2 Exclude Evidence Photos & Video Taken by Father & Pltf w POS
Date: June 24, 2022MIL 5 Howell w POS
Date: June 24, 2022MIL 4 Exclude Evidence Motorized Cart Defective w POS
Date: June 24, 2022MIL 3 Exclude Evidence Target Alleged Disciminatory Motive Practice w POS
Date: June 24, 2022MIL 7 Exlude Evidence Duplicative Expert Testimony w POS
Date: June 24, 2022MIL 8 Reserve Future MILs w POS
Date: June 24, 2022MIL 6 Exclude Evidence Target Destroyed Evidence w POS
Date: June 24, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: July 25, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 25, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 25, 2018Declaration
Date: July 25, 2018Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion (No Fee)
Date: July 25, 2018Receipt for record on transfer received
Date: July 25, 2018Association of Counsel / Attorney
Date: January 18, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: November 20, 2018Case Management Conference
Date: November 28, 2018Request to Enter Default
Date: September 20, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 20, 2018ADR Referral
Date: October 17, 2019Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Declaration
Date: September 16, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Jury Trial
Date: December 28, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: November 16, 2021Motion In Limine
Date: June 23, 2022Request
Date: August 09, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: September 18, 2020Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: November 16, 2021Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: April 22, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: March 21, 2019Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: October 09, 2020Jury Trial
Date: October 05, 2020Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: August 17, 2021CMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip
Date: April 21, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Intention to Move For a New Trial
Date: October 02, 2020Deposition Designations for Trial
Date: June 22, 2022Motion In Limine
Date: June 23, 2022Motion In Limine
Date: June 23, 2022Trial Order
Date: May 11, 2022Motion In Limine
Date: June 23, 2022Motion In Limine
Date: June 23, 2022Motion In Limine
Date: June 23, 2022Motion In Limine
Date: June 23, 2022Declaration of Non-Service
Date: July 25, 2018Proof of Service by PUBLICATION of
Date: September 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 19, 2021Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial
Date: October 17, 2019Proof of Service by OVERNIGHT DELIVERY of
Date: June 16, 2020Motion In Limine
Date: June 23, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: May 11, 2022Discovery Conference
Date: October 21, 2020Motion In Limine
Date: June 23, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 25, 2018Motion In Limine
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: December 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 13, 2021Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 22, 2019Fee Waiver Granted
Date: July 25, 2018Case Management and Trial Setting Statement
Date: December 13, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: January 31, 2019Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Trial Brief
Date: June 29, 2022Trial Brief Queiros June 29 2022
Date: June 30, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: October 17, 2019Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 28, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: November 19, 2020Motion In Limine
Date: June 23, 2022Trial Brief
Date: June 30, 2022Trial Brief
Date: June 29, 2022Trial Brief
Date: June 30, 2022Opp to Pltf MIL 1 w POS
Date: June 30, 2022Opp to Pltf MIL 3 w POS
Date: June 30, 2022Opp to Pltf MIL 2 w POS
Date: June 30, 2022Queiros.Pleadings.2022.6.30.Pltf.Opposition.to.MIL.2.Photo.and.video.Printed
Date: June 30, 2022Objections Response to Pltf Designation of Depo Testimony w POS
Date: July 01, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: October 21, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 30, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 30, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 30, 2022Objection
Date: June 30, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 30, 2022Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 28, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 30, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 30, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 30, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 30, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 30, 2022Queiros.JuryTrial.2022.7.5.Witness.List
Date: July 05, 2022Queiros.Pleadings.2022.7.5.Notice.of.Settlement
Date: July 05, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: November 19, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: November 19, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: November 19, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: November 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 01, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: November 19, 2020Case Management Order
Date: July 25, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 06, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: September 22, 2020Answer
Date: November 16, 2018Queiros.Pleadings.2022.11.7.Dismissal
Date: November 07, 2022Queiros.Pleadings.2022.11.7.Dismissal.3rd.time
Date: November 08, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: November 09, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: May 22, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: October 09, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 15, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: July 17, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 26, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 05, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 14, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 15, 2019Exhibits submitted in support of
Date: June 16, 2020First Amended Complaint
Date: July 25, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: June 16, 2020Declaration
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: July 25, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 14, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: September 17, 2020Answer
Date: July 25, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: July 10, 2019Opposition
Date: July 25, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: July 25, 2018Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: July 25, 2018Order
Date: July 25, 2018Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Opposition
Date: July 25, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 25, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 25, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 25, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 25, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Proposed Order Received
Date: July 25, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: July 25, 2018Request For
Date: July 25, 2018Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: July 25, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: July 25, 2018Proposed Order Received
Date: July 25, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: July 25, 2018Notice
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion (No Fee)
Date: July 25, 2018Proof of Service on CORPORATION, LLC, etc.
Date: July 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Queiros.Pleadings.2022.11.7.Dismissal.3rd | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Queiros.Pleadings.2022.11.7.Dismissal | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5 DAYS Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5 DAY TRIAL Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference
Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Queiros.JuryTrial.2022.7.5.Witness | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Queiros.Pleadings.2022.7.5.Notice.of.Settlement | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Objections Response to Pltf Designation of Depo Testimony w POS | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Trial Brief Queiros June 29 2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.