Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pruitt Robert, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Hector Foreign Car And Machine Shop Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Kenji Machida presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Robert Pruitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 16, 2018Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Bench Warrant Recall) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-22T00:00:00Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Hector Foreign Car and Machine Shop, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Order on Request for Court Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 16, 2018Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court
Date: November 28, 2017Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)
Date: December 22, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
Date: January 22, 2018Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)
Date: January 22, 2018Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: January 22, 2018Request for Court Order and Answer
Date: February 23, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]
Date: February 23, 2018Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination
Date: February 28, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/06/2018
Date: March 06, 2018Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer
Date: March 05, 2018Order on Request for Court Order
Date: March 06, 2018Minute Order - (Court Order)
Date: March 06, 2018Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: April 23, 2018Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - FOR ORAP
Date: July 06, 2018Subpoena & Proof of Service
Date: July 06, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
Date: August 27, 2018Minute Order - (Bench Warrant Recall)
Date: September 04, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Bench Warrant Recall) of 09/04/2018
Date: September 04, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
Date: November 05, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: November 16, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/16/2018
Date: November 16, 2018Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order
Date: November 16, 2018Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Robert Pruitt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/06/2018; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Hector Foreign Car and Machine Shop, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/16/2018; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 16, 2018Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Bench Warrant Recall) of 09/04/2018; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.