Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martino Brenda Lee, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by Bowne Ryan David, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with John D. Early presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryOther Probate With At Least One Hearing (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time300 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request - Dismissal (Without prejudice (Petition) ) Filed by Attorney |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | DISP: Denied-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding Spousal Property Hearing - Held Judge: Daniel |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition Denied | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding Spousal Property Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Daniel |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding Spousal Property Hearing - Held - Continued Judge: Daniel |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.