Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Schweitzer Jay, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Conti Laura Gertilda-M, Conti Laura Gertilda-M., against Shore Jay, represented by Gonzalez Jamie Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Daniel Juarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel Juarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2017 |
CategoryTrust (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time174 days |
Proof of Service - Proof of Service
Date: December 06, 2017Proof of Service - Proof of Service of Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: March 27, 2018Motion - New Trial
Date: April 05, 2018Declaration - Declaration in Support of Motion for New Trial
Date: April 05, 2018Motion - Quash - Motion to Quash Subpoena
Date: August 30, 2018Notice - Notice of Taking Motion Off Calendar
Date: September 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order (After Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order (After Hearing ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 99, Wada, Robert S, Presiding Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Trust 17200 Hearing - Held Judge: Wada Robert S |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 99, Wada, Robert S, Presiding Accounting Hearing - Held Accounting Hearing - Held Judge: Wada Robert S |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 99, Wada, Robert S, Presiding Petition Hearing - Held Petition Hearing - Held Judge: Wada Robert S |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition Denied (Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) filed on June 4, 2018 by Jay Shore. ) | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition Denied (Account - Trust (Subsequent) filed on March 26, 2018 by Jay Shore. ) | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition Denied (Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) filed on January 22, 2018 by Jay Shore. ) | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition Granted (Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) filed on August 2, 2017 by JAY SCHWEITZER. ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.