Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hernandez Miguel Mata, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Glenn Shamilah Myiesha, Lopez Ralph Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Ralph Garcia Lopez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Miguel Mata Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Ralph Garcia Lopez (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ralph Garcia Lopez (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Miguel Mata Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Ralph Garcia Lopez (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Miguel Mata Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 22, 2017Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 04, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)
Date: September 08, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: November 08, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: December 10, 2019Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: September 04, 2020Complaint
Date: September 05, 2017Summons - on Complaint
Date: September 05, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Miguel Mata Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Miguel Mata Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Ralph Garcia Lopez (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Ralph Garcia Lopez (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ralph Garcia Lopez (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Ralph Garcia Lopez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Miguel Mata Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.