Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Genchel Robin Fierer, Jacobson Shawn David, against Flores Jacquelyn Rose, Flores Saul, Martinez Braulio, Sysco Los Angeles Inc., represented by Bordin-Wosk Joshua D, Hamann Howard Evans, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Wendy W. Y. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 22, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: Braulio Martinez (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 07, 2019Answer; Filed by: Sysco Los Angeles, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Saul Flores (Defendant); Jacquelyn Rose Flores (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Sysco Riverside, Inc., (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Saul Flores (Defendant); Jacquelyn Rose Flores (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 14, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 28, 2017Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 18, 2018Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 15, 2017Notice (name extension) - of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: August 30, 2018Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: November 27, 2017Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 22, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: August 22, 2017Complaint
Date: August 22, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 22, 2017Summons - on Complaint
Date: August 22, 2017Answer
Date: October 02, 2017Answer
Date: January 05, 2018Answer
Date: February 15, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: August 20, 2018Answer
Date: September 06, 2018Notice (name extension) - Notice of Settlement
Date: November 01, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: December 05, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/05/2018
Date: December 05, 2018Reply (name extension) - Reply Reply to Contest GFS w POS
Date: January 24, 2019Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement
Date: February 08, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: February 14, 2019Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: February 15, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: March 07, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.