Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Annastasia Parraga, Annastasia Parraga-Allard, Kenneth Allard, Kenneth Ronald Allard, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryGuardianship: Person Only |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
January 21, 2020 | Hearing | Hearing: Appoint Guardian Person | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Letters: Guardianship | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order: Appoint Guardian | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | CI Report: Guardianship Appointment | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Consent: Proposed Guardian Consent of Proposed Guardianship |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Consent: Proposed Guardian Consent of Proposed Guardianship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.