Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Santa Clara County Departmentj Of Child Support Services, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Jack S. Kasahara, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order amended proposed order enforcing money judment |
|
April 27, 2018 | Hearing | Hearing: Petition | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement/Receipt | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Lawrence L. Yeargain in Response to Petition to Enforce Money Judgment Against Beneficiary | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Electronic Mail | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing: Decedent's Estate/Trust | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation with Service | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition: Amended to enforce money judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.