Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hunter Marlena, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Huynh Huong Van, Huynh My Ngoc, Huynh Tifany, represented by Gibbs Patrick Joseph, Van Enny, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames E. Blancarte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 16, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 25, 2017Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 25, 2017Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: February 08, 2018Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: February 08, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: April 04, 2018Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: April 04, 2018Motion re: (name extension) - to Compel Discovery
Date: August 29, 2018Motion to Compel (name extension)
Date: October 10, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other to Compel Discovery)
Date: October 10, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Compel Discovery)
Date: November 28, 2018Motion to Continue Trial Date - Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: November 28, 2018Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel motion to compel deposition
Date: December 21, 2018Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition
Date: January 15, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition)
Date: January 23, 2019Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: March 27, 2019Complaint - Auto
Date: June 21, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 04, 2018Declaration of Diligence; Filed by: MARLENA HUNTER (Plaintiff); As to: HUONG VAN HUYNH (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: MY NGOC HUYNH (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARLENA HUNTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: MY NGOC HUYNH (Defendant); TIFANY HUYNH (Defendant); HUONG VAN HUYNH (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Notice of attorney Lien of Dag Law Firm, APC; Filed by: MARLENA HUNTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: MARLENA HUNTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: MARLENA HUNTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: MARLENA HUNTER (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.