Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Harari Shlomo, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Apc Kashri Law, against Perez Felipe De Jesus Dba Omega Pool Plastering, represented by Jennings Marc Justin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Lawrence P. Riff presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SHLOMO HARARI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: FELIPE DE JESUS PEREZ (Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Receipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Reclassification; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 23, 2019Motion to Reclassify; Filed by: SHLOMO HARARI (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Motion to Reclassify
Date: October 16, 2017Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion))
Date: January 03, 2018Complaint - Breach of Contract
Date: May 26, 2017Cross-Complaint - of Felipe De Jesus Perez DBA Omega Pool Plastering, to Roe Defendants
Date: December 06, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.