Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hansberry Nannette, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Mehrban Morse, against Highland Development Properties, Pacific Springs Llc As Successor In Interest To Highland Development Properties A California General Partnership, represented by Chae Heedong, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 01, 2017Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: November 13, 2017Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 27, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)
Date: March 13, 2018Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: February 01, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)
Date: May 03, 2018Summons - on Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: May 03, 2018Default entered as to HIGHLAND DEVELOPMENT PRPERTIES; On the Complaint filed by HANSBERRY, NANNETTE on
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: NANNETTE HANSBERRY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by HANSBERRY, NANNETTE on
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: NANNETTE HANSBERRY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: NANNETTE HANSBERRY (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Morse Mehrban (Attorney)
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: NANNETTE HANSBERRY (Plaintiff)
Date: November 19, 2018Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Morse Mehrban (Attorney)
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by HANSBERRY, NANNETTE on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 21, 2018Summons on Amended Complaint (1st); Issued and Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default; Filed by: HIGHLAND DEVELOPMENT PROPERTIES (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: NANNETTE HANSBERRY (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Updated -- On the Complaint filed by HANSBERRY, NANNETTE on , judgment entered on is vacated
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.