Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ibgvy Shaul, S&I Construction Inc, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Shackelford Chanel J, Tucker Vernon C., against In And Out Builders Inc, Knafo Avi, Knafo Haim, Levy Kfeir, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2017 |
CategoryFraud (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Summons
Date: April 05, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 05, 2017Complaint - Fraud
Date: April 05, 2017Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing
Date: August 24, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 28, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: August 31, 2018Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: August 24, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SHAUL IBGVY (Plaintiff); S&I CONSTRUCTION INC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.