Breithaupt Deborah,
Wesco Insurance Company,
filed a(n)
Breach of Contract -
Commercial
case
represented by
Law Offices Of Hausman & Sosa Llp,
against
Breithaupt Deborah,
E&J Construction Landscape Inc,
Nguyen Dat,
Nguyen Tina,
Shephard Adam,
(total of 7)
See All
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
with Susan Bryant-Deason presiding.
Case Details for
Breithaupt Deborah v. Breithaupt Deborah
, et al.
Case Events for
Breithaupt Deborah v. Breithaupt Deborah
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
October 18, 2017
Docket Event
Notice of Related Case; Filed by: DEBORAH BREITHAUPT (Cross-Complainant)
October 10, 2017
Minute Order - (Court Order re: Cross-Complainant Deborah Breithaupts Motion...)
October 10, 2017
Docket Event
Minute Order (Court Order re: Cross-Complainant Deborah Breithaupt?s Motion...)
October 10, 2017
Docket Event
Court Order scheduled for 10/10/2017 in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/21/2017
October 10, 2017
Docket Event
OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/21/2020 in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/10/2017
October 10, 2017
Docket Event
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/18/2018 in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/10/2017
October 10, 2017
Tentative Ruling
Cross-Complainant Deborah Breithaupt’s Motion to Transfer the Case to the North Valley District Chatsworth Courthouse is taken off calendar in Department 77. On April 21, 2017, the Clerk of the Court ...
Judge: Elaine Lu or Georgina Torres Rizk
October 04, 2017
Docket Event
Hearing on Motion to Transfer scheduled for 10/10/2017 in at Department 77 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 10/04/2017
September 12, 2017
Proof of Personal Service - Answer Form to Summons