Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dodge, John, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dodge, Leilani, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Time To Trial428 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions97 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing set from 01-02-19 Contempt Hearing for Review of Probation Terms Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing on 1/2/19
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Order to Show Cause and Affidavit for Contempt by Petitioner: 08/23/18 Half Day Estimate Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Reporter's Transcript Order To Show Cause Hearing 1/2/19 (L. Welch) |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Advisement of Rights Civil and Family Advisement of Rights |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Hearing - Post disposition Petitioner Filed 08-23-18 Re Contempt, Continued for Acceptance of Appointment Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Appointed Counsel - Contempt James Petelin appointed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.