Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Almquist, Jeff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlmquist, Jeff Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions259 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time259 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Further Status Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default and Uncontested Filed | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Disclosure Filed | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.