Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarigonda, Paul Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions162 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time162 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Kast-Davids, Jana |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC Motion - Modification
Judge: Kast-Davids, Jana |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Document Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.