Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Herrera Pacheco, Arturo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Herrera, Crystal, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 28, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions220 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time369 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 2nd Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment MSE; 12/28/17 Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default - Uncontested | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Checklist | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default-Entered | |
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed JD: 04-29-17 |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration re Service of Declaration of Disclosure Preliminary and Final |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.