Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jawdat Lahlouh, Nisreen Lahlouh, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by William B. Look, against Bank Of America, Na, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Ditech Financial, Llc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, represented by Jonathan C Cahill, William A. Aspinwall, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Thang Nguyen Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThang Nguyen Barrett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Minute Order
Date: June 17, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: April 17, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 04, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 11, 2020Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: August 16, 2018Answer: Amended Complaint
Date: August 07, 2018Order
Date: July 19, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 20, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: December 28, 2017Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: January 08, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 28, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: February 16, 2021Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Date: September 20, 2018Motion: Leave
Date: March 11, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 30, 2020Motion: Leave to Amend
Date: May 26, 2020Review: Case Status
Date: June 13, 2019Review: Case Status
Date: October 10, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: May 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 12, 2020Motion (Amended)
Date: March 16, 2020Review: Case Status
Date: July 30, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 05, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 04, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 29, 2019Response/Reply
Date: December 11, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: March 11, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 10, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 28, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 11, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 25, 2020Response/Reply
Date: August 16, 2018Response/Reply
Date: December 09, 2019Review: Mediation Status
Date: February 14, 2019Review: Case Status
Date: March 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 21 |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 21 |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 26, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Leave to Amend
Judge: Department 21 |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Re Non-Opposition to Plts' Motion for Leave to Amend **Per Judge Barrett, The Court Declines to Sign the Proposed Order. Not Every Agreement Between the Parties Should be Transformed into a Court Order** |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (Party) Proposed SAC. |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion (Amended) for Amendment of Pleading to Substitute Assignee of Debt Collector - 5/26/20, 9am, D21 Judge: Thang Nguyen Barrett |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Env. #4155393, Your caption page should state "exhibit" since you are attaching a copy of your 2nd amended complaint. |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.