Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Letitia Pierce, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Curtis George Hoke, against Imerys Talc America, Inc. F K A Luzenac America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. F K A Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Brian C. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian C. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryMass Tort Unlimited (40) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time89 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Order Re Coordination of Potential Add-On Cases | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Submission of Potential Add-On Cases for Coordination of This Case Into JCCP 4872 | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Staying Action Due to Pending Coordination Proceedings signed/BCW | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order: Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/BCW |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Civil Lawsuit Notice (1st CMC set for 4/20/18 at 10am in D1; assigned to Hon. Brian C. Walsh) Judge: Brian C. Walsh |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit: Venue | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.