Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
First Technology Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Thomas J. Prenovost, against Eduardo Navarro, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Christopher G. Rudy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher G. Rudy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time916 days |
This complaint is filed by First Technology Federal Credit Union against Eduardo Navarro and other unknown defendants. The complaint alleges breach of contract and common counts. The plaintiff, First Technology Federal Credit Union, is a federally in...
Conference: Case Management
Date: April 17, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 28, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2018Hearing: Order of Examination
Date: March 28, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 18, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: December 28, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 23, 2018Dismissal
Date: March 21, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 18, 2018Application: Order of Examination
Date: January 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Filed) 2/26/19, Sacremento, Unsatisfied |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Old atty: Caudill / New atty: Prenovost |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 28, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Order of Examination
Judge: Department 7 |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment: Issued | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ: Execution (Issued) Sacremento : $35,759.51 |
|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application: Order of Examination HRG 3/28/19 Application And Order For Appearance And Examination |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default $35,734.51, signed by Judge Zepeda, mailed |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 18, 2018 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.