Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ecological Concerns, Incorporated, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by William Cornelius Last, against Proven Management, Inc., Safeco Insurance Company Of America, Santa Clara Valley Water District, represented by Jeffrey Frank Oneal, Juliana Salfiti, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Peter H. Kirwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeter H. Kirwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time168 days |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: December 27, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 26, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 02, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: March 12, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: June 13, 2018Conference: Case Management
Date: April 17, 2018Answer/Response (No Fee)
Date: February 23, 2018Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: April 16, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal |
|
April 17, 2018 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 19 |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) to Complaint; Atty Salfiti |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal ONLY as to Safeco Insurance Co. of America; Santa Clara County Water District |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response (No Fee) to Complaint; Atty Oneal |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.