Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Flora Garcia-Sepulveda filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Jp Morgan Chase Bank N.A., in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Thang Nguyen Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2017 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by Juan Jose Perez, Luis Estrada, and Maria Estrada against Hortensia Salgado. The cross-complainants are joint tenants who own and occupy a property in Campbell, California. They allege that the conveyance o...
Minute Order
Date: March 07, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: July 21, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 13, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 25, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 10, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 21, 2020Conference: Trial Setting
Date: June 25, 2019Conference: Trial Setting
Date: November 12, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: October 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 14, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 12, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: December 01, 2020Review: Mediation Status
Date: April 04, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 26, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 06, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 26, 2019Review: Mediation Status
Date: November 15, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 08, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: February 20, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: March 06, 2018Review: Mediation Status
Date: August 02, 2018Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: October 22, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: November 15, 2017Stipulation and Order: Ex Parte
Date: February 21, 2018Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: April 17, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 15, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 05, 2019Answer: Amended Complaint
Date: July 10, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 07, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: July 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 21 |
|
July 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 21 |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer: Amended Complaint 2nd, atty Nichani |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint atty Nichani |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Re: Stipulation and Order: See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Folan, Dept. 6. EFS 2/20/20rb Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney old: Pro Per, new: Nichani |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.