Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Matthew Gingery, Patricia Gingery, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Scott Frederick Pomerantz, against Brp California, Lp, Catherine Hedden, Ian Stone, Megan Fincher, Ronald S. Weiner, (total of 5) See All represented by Gigi Marie Knudtson, Samuel L. Phillips, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Thang Nguyen Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 06, 2017 |
CategoryBusiness Tort/Unfair Bus Prac Unlimited (07) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions340 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Plaintiffs Patricia Gingery and Matthew Gingery against Defendants BRP California, LP dba Central Animal Hospital, Ian Catherine Hedden, DVM, and Does 2-20. The complaint alleges five causes of action: frau...
Hearing: Motion to Strike
Date: August 28, 2018Conference: Case Management
Date: February 27, 2018Hearing: Demurrer
Date: July 26, 2018Hearing: Demurrer
Date: August 28, 2018Hearing: Motion to Strike
Date: July 26, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: July 13, 2018Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: November 01, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 26, 2018Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: February 15, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: November 06, 2017Motion: Strike
Date: December 26, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 19, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: October 12, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 27, 2018Answer: Amended Complaint
Date: December 03, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 28, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: July 13, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: May 04, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 22, 2020Notice: Entry of Order
Date: May 26, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: February 03, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: February 04, 2020Response/Reply
Date: February 11, 2020Motion: Leave to File
Date: February 18, 2020Response/Reply
Date: July 19, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 19, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: February 03, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: November 06, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: February 03, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 13, 2018Demurrer
Date: March 19, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: February 04, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 13, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 19, 2020Motion: Leave
Date: November 06, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 15, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: November 06, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: November 06, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: October 11, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: November 06, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: August 28, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: February 04, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 18, 2020Response/Reply
Date: July 19, 2018Motion: Strike
Date: March 19, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: October 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 21 |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Order Notice of Order Denying Motion to Amend Complaint |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement w Proof of Serivce |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter Denying Mtn for Leave |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Envelope #04037667 |
|
February 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Leave to File
Judge: Department 21 |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Proof of Service. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.