Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Devin Jacobsen, against Jacqueline Siso Lefton, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Theodore C. Zayner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheodore C. Zayner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2017 |
CategoryOther Collections Unlimited (09) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions603 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time603 days |
Minute Order
Date: August 07, 2018Notice: Settlement
Date: March 20, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: April 24, 2018Order
Date: March 28, 2019Conference: Trial Setting
Date: July 31, 2018Notice: Settlement
Date: March 20, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 28, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: March 20, 2019Order: Ex Parte
Date: November 07, 2018Conference: Case Management
Date: November 21, 2017Motion: Admissions Deemed Admitted
Date: January 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 23, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: November 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 21, 2017Memorandum: At Issue
Date: February 13, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order on settlement agreement - this case is dismissed with the court retaining jurisdiction per CCP664.6 - signed by Judge Kulkarni |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Settlement Agreement |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Notice of Settlement |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal PER 664.6 |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order: Ex Parte Application to continue trial is GRANTED and shall be heard on 2-19-19 at 8:45AM in Dept. 6, signed Judge Stoelker. Judge: Theodore C. Zayner |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application - Notice Required Application to continue trial, by atty DiPiero. |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice HRG 2/19/19 - Notice of Trial |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.