Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
David Guysi, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Shaun Setareh, against Bombardier Mass Transit Corporation, Bombardier Transportation Services Usa Corporation, represented by Bruno William Katz, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Patricia M. Lucas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Answer: Amended Complaint
Date: January 19, 2018Motion: Change of Venue
Date: October 06, 2017Conference: Case Management
Date: November 17, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2017Minute Order
Date: October 06, 2017Minute Order
Date: May 11, 2018Order
Date: August 14, 2020Motion: Preliminary Approval
Date: August 14, 2020Motion: Preliminary Approval
Date: July 23, 2020Notice: Settlement
Date: June 27, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: May 11, 2018Order: Proposed
Date: July 23, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 17, 2019Order
Date: December 26, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 04, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 14, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 19, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
9 COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA 12 DAVID GUYSI, on behalf of himself, all others similarly situated, 13 TENTATIVE RULING RE: MOTION Plaintiff, FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS 14 ACTION SETTLEMENT vs. 16 SERVICES ...
Judge: Patricia Lucas |
|
June 16, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
9 COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA 12 DAVID GUYSI, on behalf of himself, all others similarly situated, 13 TENTATIVE RULING RE: MOTION Plaintiff, FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS 14 ACTION SETTLEMENT vs. 16 SERVICES ...
Judge: Patricia Lucas |
|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Final Fairness Hearing
Judge: Department 3 |
|
August 14, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
9 COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA 12 DAVID GUYSI, on behalf of himself, all others similarly situated, 13 TENTATIVE RULING RE: MOTION Plaintiff, FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF 14 CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT vs. 16 SER...
Judge: Patricia Lucas |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Preliminary Approval Order HRG 8/14/20 - signed/PML |
|
August 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Preliminary Approval
Judge: Department 3 |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Lodging Stipulation to Amend Settlement |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion: Preliminary Approval | |
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.