Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ms Services, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shawn Matthew Olson, against Connie L Martin, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 03, 2017 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions177 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time1120 days |
Minute Order
Date: March 27, 2018Motion: Order
Date: October 09, 2018Order
Date: October 11, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: August 15, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 10, 2018Conference: Case Management
Date: October 24, 2017Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: February 10, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 24, 2017Response/Reply
Date: March 10, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 30, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: March 04, 2020Request: Judicial Notice
Date: August 15, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 27, 2020Notice: Ruling
Date: October 18, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: February 10, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 20, 2018Request: Judicial Notice
Date: February 10, 2020Motion: Other
Date: August 15, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: March 27, 2018Order
Date: March 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS re: Motion to Set Aside the Default and Default Judgment Grants; Motion to vacate the Assignment Order Grants Signed by Judge Kulkarni |
|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Plaintiff's Case Management Statement |
|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter ENV#4215412 / FAC: Judgment already entered on 6/21/2018. A court order is required. |
|
March 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Vacate
Judge: Department 8 |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Concerning Relating of Cases |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply in Support of Motion to Vacate |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Opposition to Defendant's Mtn to Vacate Default Judgment |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Related Cases 19CV359043 |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.