Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Elizabeth P. Ancheta, Raymond M. Gray, Timothy A. Gray, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mark H. Pierce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark H. Pierce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2017 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions585 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time684 days |
Order
Date: May 14, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 29, 2019Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: January 29, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: April 25, 2019Judgment
Date: February 04, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: January 28, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: January 25, 2019Order
Date: February 04, 2019Judgment
Date: April 08, 2019Motion: Appoint Receiver/Special Master
Date: November 01, 2018Motion: Withdraw as attorney
Date: July 24, 2018Motion: Withdraw as attorney
Date: February 08, 2018Application and Order: Ex Parte
Date: January 28, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: October 17, 2017Minute Order
Date: November 01, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 10, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: August 31, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: February 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 18, 2017Minute Order
Date: February 08, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: October 18, 2018Separate Statement
Date: October 18, 2018Request: Judicial Notice
Date: August 31, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: August 31, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: August 31, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 24, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 20, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 13, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 19, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: October 09, 2018Order
Date: July 24, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 04, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: April 24, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 24, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 20, 2018Request: Judicial Notice
Date: September 11, 2018Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: October 18, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: October 18, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 27, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: June 19, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: June 29, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: March 20, 2018Order
Date: November 07, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: September 11, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: September 11, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: February 19, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: October 18, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: October 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Entry of Order Approving the receiver's final account and report |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice re: Withdrawal of Stipulation for Entry of Order |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Summary $5,510.11 |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Stipulation |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice re: Entry of Judgment |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment For Cancellation of Instruments |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Order | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore re: reporter Cary Blue LaTurino for 1-29-19 hearing - GRANTED by Judge Pierce |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment In favor of Plt Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., and against defs Elizabeth Ancheta, Raymond M. Gray, Sr., and Timothy A. Gray. Plt is deemed a prevailing party under CCP 1032 - signed by Judge Pierce |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order re: 1-29-19 Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication - GRANTED by Judge Pierce *see order for details* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.