Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Andrei Belorousou, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Victoria L Gutierrez, against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, represented by Christian Joseph Rowley, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mark H. Pierce presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 24, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions198 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time990 days |
This complaint is a verified second amended complaint for damages and demand for a jury trial. The plaintiff, Andrei Belorousou, is filing a complaint against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals and Does 1 through 50. The complaint alleges various violations...
Hearing: Demurrer
Date: October 24, 2017Review: Mediation Status
Date: June 14, 2018Motion: Compel
Date: June 18, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 05, 2019Motion: Seal Records
Date: April 25, 2019Motion: Order
Date: July 11, 2019Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: April 25, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: August 15, 2017Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: July 11, 2019Separate Statement
Date: June 05, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 30, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 18, 2019Response/Reply
Date: April 18, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: June 21, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 11, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 11, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: April 11, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 05, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: June 10, 2019Response/Reply
Date: April 18, 2019Order: Submitted Matter
Date: April 26, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 18, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 11, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: April 11, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: April 11, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: April 11, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: April 05, 2019Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: February 08, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 06, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: April 05, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 05, 2019Stipulation
Date: May 31, 2018Motion: Seal
Date: February 08, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 05, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: February 08, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: April 05, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 18, 2018Separate Statement
Date: February 08, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: February 08, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 18, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: June 08, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: April 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 16, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 29, 2017Answer: Amended Complaint
Date: December 06, 2017Minute Order
Date: October 24, 2017Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: November 02, 2017Minute Order
Date: August 16, 2017Minute Order
Date: October 17, 2019Order
Date: November 13, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: December 27, 2019Response/Reply
Date: September 03, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: January 16, 2018Motion: Enforce Settlement
Date: September 10, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: April 05, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: April 05, 2019Response/Reply
Date: June 11, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 03, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: August 27, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: June 25, 2019Order
Date: April 05, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: April 16, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 11, 2019Minute Order
Date: December 19, 2019Conference: Trial Setting
Date: February 05, 2019Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: December 19, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 25, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: July 11, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: February 08, 2019Review: Mediation Status
Date: October 18, 2018Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: October 17, 2019Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Date: January 09, 2020Request: Dismissal
Date: April 11, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: April 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Wrongful Termination, Unlimited |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal entire with prejudice by atty Gutierrez |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 19, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 2 |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Enforce Settlement |
|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 2 |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ANDREA BEDNAROVA REGARDING SERVICE OF PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR ORDER AND JUDGMENT TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.