Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Shannon Gaines, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Daniel Joseph Mash, represented by Candice N. Hamant, Emmett Edward Seltzer, Jordan Allen Rodman, Julie Diane Mcelroy, Kathleen Cheatum Miller, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Maureen A. Folan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen A. Folan Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2017 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions521 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by NOR-CAL INSULATION, INC. against ROES 1-20, inclusive. The cross-complainant alleges that the cross-defendants, who are currently unknown, were acting as agents, servants, and employees of their co-cross-d...
Conference: Case Management
Date: August 01, 2017Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Date: January 08, 2021Declaration
Date: December 02, 2020Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
Date: December 14, 2020Order After Hearing - POS
Date: December 16, 2020Notice: Entry of Order
Date: November 12, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: January 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 26, 2021Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: August 05, 2021Conference: Further Case Management
Date: April 10, 2018Review: Case Status
Date: August 21, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: January 22, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: July 30, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: January 07, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 08, 2020Motion: Approve Good Faith Settlement
Date: November 03, 2020Motion: Approve Good Faith Settlement
Date: December 15, 2020Motion: Approve Good Faith Settlement
Date: February 04, 2021Review: Mediation Status
Date: February 25, 2021Notice: Association/Co-Counsel
Date: November 04, 2020Substitution: Attorney
Date: December 11, 2020Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Date: November 20, 2020Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: December 14, 2020Notice: Entry of Order
Date: January 04, 2021Order After Hearing - POS
Date: February 17, 2021Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Date: April 08, 2021Request: Dismissal
Date: August 30, 2021Order After Hearing - POS
Date: November 03, 2020Request: Dismissal
Date: November 13, 2020Motion: Good Faith Settlement
Date: December 02, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 09, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: December 14, 2020Notice
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 11, 2021Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: December 21, 2020Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: March 25, 2021Request: Dismissal
Date: April 05, 2021Request: Dismissal
Date: August 30, 2021Request: Dismissal
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 15, 2020Request: Dismissal
Date: January 06, 2021Order After Hearing - POS
Date: February 19, 2021Request: Dismissal
Date: September 10, 2021Notice: Settlement
Date: June 29, 2021Stipulation and Order
Date: June 19, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 08, 2020Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: March 24, 2020Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
Date: December 20, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: February 18, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: March 24, 2020Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: October 21, 2019Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: May 23, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 11, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 15, 2019Order: Ex Parte
Date: May 23, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: April 03, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 22, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 04, 2019Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: January 04, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 10, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 07, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 28, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: November 21, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: December 12, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: December 12, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: December 12, 2018Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: November 16, 2017Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
Date: March 21, 2018Stipulation
Date: April 16, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 02, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: August 15, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 13, 2018Cross-Complaint
Date: August 15, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: June 21, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: June 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 21, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 22, 2018Cross-Complaint
Date: November 16, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 10, 2018Complaint: Amended
Date: July 27, 2017Minute Order
Date: August 02, 2017Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: April 10, 2017Notice
Date: February 07, 2020Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: July 25, 2017Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: December 24, 2019Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: November 16, 2017Cross-Complaint
Date: November 16, 2017Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: September 25, 2020Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: July 16, 2020Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: March 24, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 10, 2017Proof of Service
Date: October 23, 2020Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: September 30, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: March 24, 2020Default Entered
Date: March 10, 2020Demand: Jury Trial
Date: May 07, 2019Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: December 17, 2018Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
Date: August 07, 2018Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Date: May 23, 2018Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Date: July 03, 2018Declaration
Date: May 23, 2019Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: March 25, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: August 15, 2018Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Date: May 17, 2018Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Date: February 13, 2020Default Not Entered
Date: February 13, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 20, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 18, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 21, 2020Motion: Good Faith Settlement
Date: October 23, 2020Motion: Good Faith Settlement
Date: October 21, 2020Motion: Good Faith Settlement
Date: September 21, 2020Notice: Association/Co-Counsel
Date: August 20, 2019Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
Date: March 24, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 24, 2020Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Date: July 03, 2018Notice
Date: November 19, 2019Default Not Entered
Date: September 13, 2018Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: September 11, 2020Notice: Association/Co-Counsel
Date: July 18, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 01, 2020Motion: Good Faith Settlement
Date: August 20, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 25, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 24, 2020Default Pending
Date: September 13, 2018Default Not Entered
Date: September 13, 2018Notice
Date: February 07, 2019Default Entered
Date: May 06, 2019Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: November 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 14, 2020Order: Proposed
Date: September 22, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 18, 2020Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: August 20, 2020Substitution: Attorney
Date: October 11, 2018Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: April 10, 2017Declaration
Date: October 23, 2020Default Not Entered
Date: December 19, 2019Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Date: July 12, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 03, 2020Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: October 28, 2020Default Not Entered
Date: September 13, 2018Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: August 15, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: August 01, 2019Request: Dismissal
Date: August 07, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 09, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 30, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 26, 2018Order
Date: September 06, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: June 06, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 04, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 13, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 30, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: December 21, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: July 24, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 09, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 06, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 07, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 11, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 07, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 15, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 22, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 07, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 21, 2017Request: Dismissal
Date: October 09, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 29, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: October 30, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 06, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 24, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 03, 2018Order
Date: December 11, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 31, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 13, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 08, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 07, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 09, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 04, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 23, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 08, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 26, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 24, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 17, 2017Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)
Date: November 02, 2018Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: May 29, 2020Order
Date: September 06, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 13, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal of 12/14/20 AMC Glass Co., Inc.'s X-Comp |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal of 3/24/20 Nor-Cal Insulation, Inc.'s X-Comp |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal of 11/16/17 X-Comp filed by T. Miller Construction, Inc. |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter #7000752 Request for Dismissal- X-Comps (3/24/20, 12/14/20) are still active. Signatures of X-Comp's counsel is necessary to dismiss entire action. |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice: Change Address/Firm Name |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.