Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Catherine Martinez, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Abraham P Mathew, against Quality Respite And Home Care, Inc., represented by Elizabeth Helen Murphy, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mary E. Arand presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2017 |
CategoryWrongful Termination Unlimited(36) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: February 28, 2019Review: Mediation Status
Date: April 26, 2018Review: Mediation Status
Date: January 04, 2018Conference: Case Management
Date: July 25, 2017Response/Reply
Date: February 21, 2019Motion: Tax Costs
Date: April 29, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: February 14, 2019Request
Date: February 28, 2019Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: December 14, 2018Separate Statement
Date: December 14, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: December 14, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: April 16, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 30, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: March 11, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: February 21, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 28, 2019Separate Statement
Date: February 14, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 27, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 04, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 26, 2018Review: Mediation Status
Date: August 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 29, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: February 21, 2019Conference: Trial Setting
Date: October 23, 2018Response/Reply
Date: February 21, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: February 14, 2019Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: May 09, 2019Request: Judicial Notice
Date: April 29, 2019Motion: Tax Cost
Date: August 29, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: December 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Motion: Tax Cost
Judge: Department 9 |
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance H046969 |
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal: Notice to Court Reporter H046969 |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Deposit: Reporter's Transcript $375.00 check deposited taken on Notice of Undocument Action. |
|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Appeal: Appellant's Default Notice | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Designation: Appellant Rule 8.124 H046969 |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.