Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Angel Mendez, Carmen Molina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Katherine Elizabeth Freyre, against Ezequiel Araujo-Catalan, Full Service Carwash, Inc., Full Service Car Wash, Inc., Yasael Gonzalez-Hernandez, represented by James Peter Molinelli, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with James L. Stoelker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Stoelker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time594 days |
Minute Order
Date: May 31, 2018Review: Mediation Status
Date: January 25, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 09, 2018Notice: Settlement
Date: July 13, 2018Review: Mediation Status
Date: April 26, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: August 14, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: April 25, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 26, 2017Review: Mediation Status
Date: May 31, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 12, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 26, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 10, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 28, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 25, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Partial: Complaint With Prejudice as to Def Ezequiel Araujo-Catalan Only (Katherine Freyre) |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Partial, With Prejudice, as to Defs Full Service Carwash Inc., Ysael Gonzalez-Hernandez, and San Jose Touchless Car Wash ONLY |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Notice of Settlement of Entire Case, Unconditional |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 31, 2018 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 13 |
|
April 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 13 |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order ADR Stip & Order for Mediation With Vivian Williamson on 5-8-18. the MSR on 4-26-18 is cont. to 5-31-18 10:30 D13, Signed by Judge Stoelker Judge: James L. Stoelker |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
January 25, 2018 | Hearing |
Review: Mediation Status
Judge: Department 13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.