Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hoffmann, Martin, against Evans, Lauren, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2017 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions75 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time75 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Returned | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.