Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Diaz, Paulina, Diaz, Victor Hugo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management131 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2017 |
CategoryLimited Other Collections (09) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time65 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Assignment of Judgment, Filed | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.