Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael, Lina M, against Buenaventura, Ruel L, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2017 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time787 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint for Damages, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.