Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jarrar, Aktham, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Freese, Kristine, Richie, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Connolly, Rebecca presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConnolly, Rebecca Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims: 1,501 - 5,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time435 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Connolly, Rebecca |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Evidence Hearing
Judge: Guy, Denine |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.