Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vlachos, Michael, against Xxxxxxx, Xxxxxxxxx, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGallagher, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management350 days |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time350 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | 30 Day Summons | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.