Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vlachos, Michael, against Arciniega, Juan A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGallagher, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management352 days |
Filing DateDecember 25, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time352 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Burdick, Paul |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 25, 2017 | Docket Event | 30 Day Summons | |
December 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.