Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A.,, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N., against Somerville, James F, represented by Bradley, John F, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGallagher, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
Time To Trial350 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time350 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | 30 Day Summons | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.